Simonian v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jon Simonian
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00717
Filed: May 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/28/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief: to extend the time 30 days to June 3, 2017, for Plaintiff to file his Reply Brief, in accordance with the Court's Scheduling Order. This is Plaintiff's first request for an extension. It requested because Plaintiff's counsel has an overloaded schedule at the time this Brief is currently due. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/2/2017. (Herman, H)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DISCHARGING Order to Show Cause (Doc. 14): Having considered counsel's response, the Court's Order to Show Cause issued on April 12, 2017, is HEREBY DISCHARGED and no sanctions will be imposed. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/2/12017. (Herman, H)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the Plaintiff's Social Security Action Should Not Be Deemed Unopposed. RESPONSE DUE: April 19, 2017. Defendant is HEREBY ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why Plaintiff's Social Security appeal should not be deemed un opposed and why sanctions should not issue for Defendant's failure to comply with the Court's order. Defendant shall file its written response to this order to show cause on or before April 19, 2017. FURTHER, the Clerk of the Court is dire cted to serve a copy of this order on David Shelledy, Chief of the Civil Division of the Eastern District of California, at United States Attorney's Office, Robert T. Matsui United States Courthouse, 501 I Street, Suite 10-100, Sacramento, CA 95814. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/12/2017. (Herman, H)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER for a First Extension of Time for Defendant to File her Responsive Brief. Defendant shall have a 30-day extension, or until March 31, 2017, in which to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/27/2017. (Thorp, J)
December 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Stipulation and ORDER for Extenstion of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief: to extend the time 30 days to January 29, 2017, for Plaintiff to file his Opending Brief, in accordance with the Court's Scheduling Order. This is Plaintiff's first request for an extension. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/27/2016. (Herman, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simonian v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Simonian
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Chen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?