Garcia v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Darlene Garcia
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2016cv00730
Filed: May 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to Close the Action (Stipulation), signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/23/2018.CASE CLOSED (Martin-Gill, S)
May 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER DISCHARGING 88 Order to Show Cause, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/2/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 5/25/2018. (Hall, S)
April 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/16/2018. Show Cause Response due within 14 days. (Hall, S)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 80 Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/7/2018. (Hall, S)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for 10/25/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.) PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/3/2017. (Thorp, J)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RELATING AND REASSIGNING CASES signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/17/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Remand, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/23/2016. (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garcia v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlene Garcia
Represented By: Steve Mikhov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Aaron M. Brian
Represented By: Scott Steven Shepardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?