Defrenza v. Progressive Express Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Michael Defrenza
Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2016cv00736
Filed: May 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Closing the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/15/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER AFTER 31 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/12/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 3/16/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings, including the pretrial conference and trial, are VACATED. (Hall, S)
November 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/14/2017. (Kusamura, W)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order VACATING Pre-trial Conference and Pre-trial Statement Deadline, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/9/2017. (Rosales, O)
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER to Continue the 16 MOTION for SUMMARY JUDGMENT Hearing currently set for 8/21/2017 to 8/28/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/10/2017. (Kusamura, W)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/1/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 12/2/2016. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 9/6/2016; Non-Expert 6/9/2017; Expert 6/9/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 1/18/2017 at 08:15 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 6/23/2017; Hearing by 7/21/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 8/4/2017; Hearing by 9/27/2017. Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Bench Trial set for 1/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Defrenza v. Progressive Express Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Michael Defrenza
Represented By: Seth N O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Progressive Express Insurance Company
Represented By: Julia Azrael
Represented By: Katherine Lesley Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?