Alvarado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roberto Alvarado
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00746
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/9/17. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE THIRD STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants response to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before July 7, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before July 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before July 5, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before July 20, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER for an Extension of Time for Defendant to File Reponse to Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/28/17. (Gonzalez, R)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Order accepting Plaintiff's 19 Opening Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/6/2017. Plaintiffs counsel shall serve this order on the firms managing partner. (Rosales, O)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER AMENDING SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling order in this action is amended as follows: Defendants opposition to Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before May 3, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply brief, if any, shall be filed on or before May 18, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/4/2017. (Hernandez, M)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE OPENING BRIEF. The March 27, 2017 stipulation for an extension of time to file Plaintiffs opening brief is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; Plaintiffs counsel shall serv e this order on Plaintiff within five (5) days of the date of service of this order; and Plaintiffs counsel shall file a proof of service within five (5) days of the date he serves Plaintiff with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/2017. (Hernandez, M)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before March 24, 2017; Defendants opposition shall be filed on or before April 24, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before May 9, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/23/2017. (Hernandez, M)
December 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Order re stipulation to extend briefing schedule, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/2016. (Plaintiff's letter Brief Deadline: 12/2/2016; Responses due by 1/6/2016) (Rosales, O)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/1/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alvarado v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Alvarado
Represented By: Steven Gilbert Rosales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Scott J. Borrowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?