Brown v. Robles et al

Plaintiff: Quincy Brown
Defendant: R. Robles and C. Riley
Case Number: 1:2016cv00751
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 17 Motion for Summary Judgment, without prejudice for failure to provide RAND NOTICE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/2018. 14-Day Filing Deadline. (Lundstrom, T)
November 13, 2017 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' request for extension of time to take Plaintiff's Deposition 13 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/13/2017. Deadline set for 12/14/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 14, 2017 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 9 Plaintiff's Request for Entry of Default signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/14/2017. (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Robles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quincy Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Robles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?