Cole v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gerald Dean Cole
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00754
Filed: May 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 09/26/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Reply Brief: extend 30 days to September 16, 2017, for Plaintiff to file his Reply Brief, in accordance with the Courts Scheduling Order. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/16/2017. (Herman, H)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF (Doc. 26). Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiff's Opening Brief on or before July 31, 2017. All other deadlines shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/26/2017. (Thorp, J)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Joint STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment: that Defendant shall have a 45-day extension, or until July 24, 2017, in which to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/7/2017. (Herman, H)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule (re Stipulation Doc. 19): that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and including April 26, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief in Support of Plaintiff's Complaint; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/28/2017. (Herman, H)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Plaintiff's Opening Brief. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time to March 25, 2017, in which to file his opening brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Courts Scheduling Order shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/22/2017. (Thorp, J)
December 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER for Extension of Time to File Confidential Letter Brief: to extend the time 30 Days to December 19, 2016, for Plaintiff to serve his Confidential Letter Brief on the Defendant, in accordance with the Court's Scheduling Order. This is Plaintiff's first request for an extension. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/8/2016. (Herman, H)
June 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/1/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Dean Cole
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Heather Moss, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?