Sosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Christina S Sosa
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00757
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule. Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and including March 14, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's opening brief in support of Plaintiff's Complaint; and that all other deadlines set forth in the Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/1/2017. (Thorp, J)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Extending Briefing Schedule (re Stipulation Doc. 12): that Plaintiff shall have an extension of time, to and include February 27, 2017, in which to file Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and that all other deadlines set forth in the June 2, 2016 Case Management Order shall be extended accordingly. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/30/2017. (Herman, H)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/2/16. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sosa v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina S Sosa
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy Bolin, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?