Sequoia ForestKeeper v. La Price et al
Plaintiff: Sequoia ForestKeeper
Defendant: Eric La Price, Alfred Watson, Kevin Elliott and U.S. Forest Service
Case Number: 1:2016cv00759
Filed: June 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4321
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER REGARDING FEDERAL DEFENDANTS' BILL OF COSTS, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/22/2018. (Kusamura, W)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER ON CROSS-MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO ADMIT EXTRA-RECORD EVIDENCE; DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STRIKE PLAINTIFF'S EXTRA-RECORD EVIDENCE; AND PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO STRKE THE DECLARATION OF JEFFREY R. CORDES, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/15/2017. (Kusamura, W)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER GRANTING Leave to Federal Defendants and Intervenor Defendant to File Replies in Support of Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER 49 to Continue Deadline to Answer First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/22/2017. (Hall, S)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 STIPULATION and ORDER 44 Regarding First Amended Complaint and Briefing Page Limits, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/9/2017. (Hall, S)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/31/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 5/5/2017. Merits Brief: Filed by 5/12/2017; Answering Brief by 5/26/2017; Reply by 6/9/2017. Hearing on Merits Brief set for 7/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Hall, S)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Requiring Filing of the Administrative Record, Requiring Status Reports and Setting a Status Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2017. Administrative Record due by 3/20/2017. Status reports due by 2/10/2017, 3/3/2017 and 3/31/2017. Status Conference set for 2/17/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Intervene, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/4/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/21/2016. (Kusamura, W)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sequoia ForestKeeper v. La Price et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric La Price
Represented By: Joseph Frueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfred Watson
Represented By: Joseph Frueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Elliott
Represented By: Joseph Frueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Forest Service
Represented By: Joseph Frueh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia ForestKeeper
Represented By: Rachel S. Doughty
Represented By: Rene Peter Voss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?