Martin-Barnett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bernadine Martin-Barnett
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00780
Filed: June 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Merced
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 FINAL JUDGMENT and ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Social Security Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/15/2018. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Stipulation and Order modifying scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/8/2018. (Motion for Summary Judgment filed and served by 1/10/2018; Cross Motion for Summary Judgment filed and served by 2/12/2018; Response to Cross Motion due by 2/19/2018) (Rosales, O)
December 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER GRANTING the parties' request for a modification of the scheduling order as follows: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 1/5/2018; defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment due by 2/5/2018; and plaintiff's response to defendant's cross motion due by 2/19/2018. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/12/2017. (Rooney, M)
October 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Stipulation and Order modifying scheduling order, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/25/2017. (Rosales, O)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DISCHARGING the August 14, 2017, order to show cause (ECF No. 13 ) and resetting the briefing schedule as follows: a) September 26, 2017: Defendant to serve (but not file) response to Plaintiff's letter brief; b) October 13, 2017: Partie s to file and serve stipulation to remand, if resolved; c) October 26, 2017: Plaintiff to file and serve motion for summary judgment; d) November 27, 2017: Defendant to file and serve cross-motion for summary judgment; and e) December 12, 2017: Plaintiff to file and serve response to cross-motion. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/29/2017. (Rooney, M)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Granting 2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/7/16. (Verduzco, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin-Barnett v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernadine Martin-Barnett
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?