November 29, 2018 |
Filing
121
ORDER Directing the Clerk of the Court to Close the Case 120 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/28/2018: In light of the parties' stipulation, this action has been terminated, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii); Wilson v. City of San Jose, 111 F.3d 688, 692 (9th Cir. 1997), and has been dismissed with prejudice. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
|
October 3, 2018 |
Filing
80
ORDER on Defendant's Motions in Limine 73 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/3/2018. (Kusamura, W)
|
September 7, 2018 |
Filing
70
Order re: dismissal with prejudice of Plaintiffs supervisory liability claim (third claim for relief), signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/6/2018. (Rosales, O)
|
July 11, 2018 |
Filing
63
ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION CONTINUING PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE DATES signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/11/2018. The settlement conference will be rescheduled from August 30, 2018 to August 22, 2018, at 1:00 p .m. in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The pretrial conference will be continued from August 29, 2018 to September 5, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto.The trial date will remain set for October 30, 2018, at 8:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Thorp, J)
|
May 22, 2018 |
Filing
60
ORDER Directing the Clerk to Terminate Defendants California Highway Patrol Officer Crewse (Crelose) and California Highway Patrol Officer McConnell signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/21/18. Officers Crewse (Crelose) and McConnell Terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
|
May 7, 2018 |
Filing
57
ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures and setting Settlement Conference for 8/30/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/7/2018. (Rooney, M)
|
December 19, 2017 |
Filing
54
ORDER on JOINT STIPULATION for CONTINUANCE of CERTAIN SCHEDULED DATES. Fact Discovery Cut-off: 1/31/18. Expert Disclosures: 2/16/18. Suppl. Expert Disclosures: 3/2/18. Expert Discovery Cut-off: 4/16/18. Non-Dispositive Mtn. Filing: 4/25/18. Non-Dispositive Mtn. Hearing: 5/23/18. Dispositive Mtn. Filing: 5/9/18. Dispositive Mtn. Hearing: 6/20/18. Settlement Conference currently set for 4/12/2018, is CONTINUED to 8/3/2018, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Jud ge Erica P. Grosjean. Pretrial Conference currently set for 5/30/2018, is CONTINUED to 8/29/2018, at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Jury Trial currently set for 7/31/2018, is CONTINUED to 10/30/2018, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/19/2017. (Timken, A)
|
October 6, 2017 |
Filing
52
ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/6/2017. (Rooney, M)
|
October 2, 2017 |
Filing
51
ORDER on JOINT STIPULATION FOR CONTINUANCE OF CERTAIN SCHEDULED DATES. Fact Discovery Cutoff: 11/29/2017. Expert Disclosures: 12/11/2017. Supplemental Expert Disclosures: 12/29/2017. Expert Discovery Cutoff: 1/26/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Filing: 1/26/2018. Non-Dispositive Motion Hearing: 2/28/2018. Dispositive Motion Filing: 2/21/2018. Dispositive Motion Hearing: 4/4/2018. Settlement Conference set for 4/12/2018, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2018, at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Jury Trial set for 7/31/2018, at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/2/2017. (Timken, A)
|
July 5, 2017 |
Filing
46
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/5/2017. (Timken, A)
|
June 26, 2017 |
Filing
43
THIRD ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for Amendments to Pleadings. The deadline for filing any motion or stipulation requesting leave to amend the pleadings is EXTENDED from June 26, 2017, to July 31, 2017. This modification does not change any other existing scheduling deadlines, including the pretrial conference and trial dates. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/23/2017. (Timken, A)
|
May 31, 2017 |
Filing
41
SECOND ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for Amendments to Pleadings. The deadline for amendments to pleadings in this case is EXTENDED from May 29, 2017 to June 26, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/31/2017. (Timken, A)
|
April 26, 2017 |
Filing
39
ORDER EXTENDING Deadline for Amendments to Pleadings. The deadline for amendments to pleadings in this case is EXTENDED from April 28, 2017 to May 29, 2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/26/2017. (Timken, A)
|
December 19, 2016 |
Filing
27
ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART 22 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint For Damages. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/16/2016. (Thorp, J)
|
October 17, 2016 |
Filing
21
STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING DATE TO FILE RESPONSE TO FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES. Defendants are granted a two-week extension of time for filing a response to the First Amended Complaint for Damages (Doc. 19). Defendants shall file a response to the First Amended Complaint for Damages on or by November 3, 2016. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/16/2016. (Timken, A)
|
September 23, 2016 |
Filing
17
ORDER on 10 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Damages. 1) Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint For Damages (Doc. 10) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; 2) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant CHP Officer Crewes (err oneously named Crelose) are DISMISSED with leave to amend; 3) Plaintiff's claims against Defendant CHP Officer McConnell are DISMISSED with leave to amend; 4) Plaintiff's claim for violation of the Fourteenth Amendment under 42 U.S.C. § ; 1983 against Defendant CHP Officer Iosefa is DISMISSED with prejudice and without leave to amend; and 5) Plaintiff may file a First Amended Complaint within 14 days of the date of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/22/2016. (Timken, A)
|