Bakari v. Gordon Trucking, Inc
Plaintiff: Catrell Bakari
Defendant: Gordon Trucking, Inc
Case Number: 1:2016cv00793
Filed: June 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Assault, Libel, and Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to CLOSE CASE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/1/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING Parties to File Dispositional Documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/30/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re Settlement Conferece. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/12/2016. (Thorp, J)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER striking Plaintiff's 4 Response to Affirmative Defenses signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/14/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bakari v. Gordon Trucking, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catrell Bakari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Trucking, Inc
Represented By: Evan Donald Beecher
Represented By: Cary G. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?