Peo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Koum Peo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00834
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending DENYING Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal. The matter is referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections due within 14 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Reply From the Record 24 ; ORDER Discharging July 19, 2017 Order to Show Cause 25 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/25/17. (Hellings, J)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY PLAINTIFFS REPLY SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD. Accordingly, the Court HEREBY ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing on or before July 26, 2017, why Plaintiffs reply (ECF No. 24) should not be stricken from the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Plaintiffs opening brief shall be filed on or before May 29, 2017; Defendants responsive pleading shall be filed on or before June 2 8, 2017; Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before July 12, 2017; and The parties are advised that due to the impact of social security cases on the Courts docket and the Courts desire to have cases decided in an expedient manner, request s for modification of the briefing scheduling will not routinely be granted and will only be granted upon a showing of good cause. Further, requests to modify the briefing schedule that are made on the eve of a deadline will be looked upon with disfavor and may be denied absent good cause for the delay in seeking an extension. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/1/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE PLAINTIFF'S CONFIDENTIAL LETTER BRIEF signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/10/2017: It is ordered that Plaintiff shall serve her confidential letter brief on February 9, 2017. The scheduling order is this action is modified accordingly. (Valdez, E)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING Application to Proceed IFP and Directing Clerk of Court to Issue Summons 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/17/16. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Koum Peo
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?