John Baker v. Cottrell, Inc

Plaintiff: John H. Baker
Defendant: Cottrell, Inc
Case Number: 1:2016cv00840
Filed: June 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER and RECEIPT for TRIAL EXHIBITS signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/1/2018. (Thorp, J)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 133 JUDGMENT dated *9/28/2018* in favor of Plaintiff against Defendant according to the jury verdict returned in open court on 9/28/2018. Civil Case Terminated. CASE CLOSED. (Thorp, J)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY. Accordingly, Plaintiffs request to reopen discovery is HEREBY DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/14/2018. (Hernandez, M)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER Denying Defendant's 71 Application for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/12/2018. (Within twenty-one days of service of this order, the parties are directed to email Renee Gaumnitz at rgaumnitz@caed.uscourts.gov to schedule pre-trial conference and trial dates.)(Gaumnitz, R)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE OPPOSITION OR STATEMENT OF NON-OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION TO REOPEN DISCOVERY. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to Plaintiffs application to reopen discovery on or before February 14, 2018. The matter will be deemed submitted upon the filing of Defendants responsive pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/5/2018. (Hernandez, M)
December 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's 48 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/29/2017. (Flores, E)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Denying 40 Motion to Amend the Complaint and Granting 51 Motion to Strike Defendant's Request for Surreply, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Re Claimant Zurich American Insurance Company's Substitution of Attorney, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/4/17. (Hellings, J)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION, PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE, AND PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REVOKE PRO HAC VICE STATUS OF DANIEL CARPENTER AND AMY LORENZ-MOSHER AND VACATING AUGUST 16, 2017 AND AUGUST 30, 2017 HEARINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/14/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION RE PRO HAC VICE ORDER (ECF No. 25) AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION (ECF No. 26) FOR HEARING ON AUGUST 16, 2017, AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE STANLEY A. BOONE. ORDER SETTING MOTION FOR REVOCATION OF PRO HAC VICE STATUSES (ECF No. 33) FOR HEARING ON AUGUST 30, 2017, AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE STANLEY A. BOONE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/31/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER ADDRESSING PLAINTIFFS OBJECTIONS TO AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for July 26, 2017 at 9:30 am before Judge McAuliffe). PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/13/2017. (Herman, H)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING Scheduling Conference from 9/19/2016 to 10/17/2016 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A joint scheduling report is due one week before the new conference date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/14/2016. (Hernandez, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: John Baker v. Cottrell, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John H. Baker
Represented By: Michael Stone-Molloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cottrell, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?