Watkins v. Greenwood, et al.
Plaintiff: Casey J Watkins
Defendant: Chad Greenwood and Lukious Sims
Case Number: 1:2016cv00850
Filed: June 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/17/2017 denying 57 Motion to Compel as moot. (Lundstrom, T)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Granting Defendants' 23 MOTION to DISMISS, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/23/17. Referred to Judge O'Neill. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Motion to Dismiss; ORDER Striking 43 Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Sims's 25 Motion to Compel; ORDER Denying Defendant Sims's Motion to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted re 29 , 34 , 38 , 39 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/18/17. (Gonzalez, R)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 33 Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/7/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's July 14, 2017 40 Motion for Extension of Time as Premature, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/18/2017. (Kusamura, W)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time, re 40 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/14/17. 21-Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Requiring Defendant Sims to File signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/13/2017. (Flores, E)
July 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Requiring Defendants to File an Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/11/2017. (Flores, E)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Requiring Defendant Greenwood to Re-Serve Sarah N. Brattin's June 19, 2017 Declaration of Plaintiff and File a Declaration Following Re-Service, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/24/17. Deadline: 6/29/2017. (Gonzalez, R)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING 12 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; ORDERED TO DISMISS certain claims for failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief and Referring Matter Back to Magistrate Judge to Initiate Service of Process Proceedings, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 12/12/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissing Certain Claims From the Action for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/22/16. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND for Failure to State a Cognizable Claim for Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/30/2016. First Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Re-Designate This Action as a Regular Civil Rights Action, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/16. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watkins v. Greenwood, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey J Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lukious Sims
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?