Stuhaan v. City of Visalia et al
Plaintiff: John Gregory Stuhaan
Defendant: City of Visalia, Mineral King Toxicology Lab, Edward Rubalcaba, Jason Salazar, Colleen Mestas and Mike Carsten
Case Number: 1:2016cv00901
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of this Action for Failure to Obey a Court Order and Failure to Prosecute. (Doc. 12) Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R - within fourteen (14) days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations, Plaintiff may file written objections with the Court. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/18/2017. (Herman, H)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to File Status Report Within Seven Days. Plaintiff shall file a written status report detailing the status of this action and the related criminal matter. If Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, this action may be dismissed without further notice based on Plaintiff's failure to comply with court orders and failure to prosecute this action. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/6/2017. (Herman, H)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISCHARGING 9 Order to Show Cause; ORDER GRANTING 10 Request for Stay, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/18/16. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stuhaan v. City of Visalia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Gregory Stuhaan
Represented By: Douglas Stewart Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Visalia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mineral King Toxicology Lab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Rubalcaba
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Salazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Mestas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Carsten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?