Thomas v. Davey et al
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas
Defendant: Dave Davey, Mike Strainer, R. L. Briggs, C. Hammond, Mary Hernandez and D. Lee
Case Number: 1:2016cv00925
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Dennis L. Beck
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim; Fourteen (14) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/1/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 46 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/17/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denial of 37 41 Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 11/06/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Fourteen-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING 34 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 21 30 Motions for Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/02/2017. (Flores, E)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Denying Request for Priority Screening of Second Amended Complaint as Moot; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 21 30 Motions for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and Restraining Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/22/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. (Flores, E)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Denying 29 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/05/2017. (Flores, E)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER DENYING, as Moot Plaintiff's 18 Motion for Priority Screening and Emergency Preliminary-Permanent Injunction and Restraining Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/14/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Adopting 19 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's 7 14 Motions for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and 13 Motion for Order to Show Cause signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/6/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regading Plaintiff's 7 13 14 Motions for Emergency Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 01/26/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due by 2/14/2017.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Davey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Strainer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. L. Briggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hammond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?