McDougal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Desiree McDougal
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv00962
Filed: July 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER for the Award and Payment of Attorney Fees Pursuant to EAJA, awarding fees in the amount of five thousand four hundred and thirty dollars and forty-two cents ($5,430.42), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. §2412(d), subject to the terms of the Stipulation. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/29/2018. (Rooney, M)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER regarding Plaintiff's 1 Social Security Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/13/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Joint stipulation for extension of time, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 7/14/2017. (Answering Brief Deadline: 8/28/2017) (Rosales, O)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED STIPULATION and ORDER as follows: For the reasons provided in the parties' stipulation, good cause is shown to extend the time for Defendant to file Defendant's Responsive Brief from June 12, 2017, to July 12, 2017, wi th other dates in this Scheduling Order (Social Security Appeal) extended accordingly. The motion for extension of time (ECF No. 15 ) filed on June 2, 2017, requests the same relief as the stipulation (ECF No. 16 ) filed on June 5, 2017. Thus, the motion for extension of time (ECF No. 15 ) is denied as moot. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/5/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/15/2017. For the reasons stated in the motion, the Court GRANTS an extension of time to file a Responsive Brief of thirty-two days from May 11, 2017 to June 12, 2017, with all other dates in this Scheduling Order (Social Security Appeal) extended accordingly. (Valdez, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McDougal v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree McDougal
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: April Alongi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?