Winn v. County of Kern et al
Plaintiff: |
Jay Winn |
Defendant: |
County of Kern, Lisa Green, Scott Tunnicliffe and Charles Brown |
Case Number: |
1:2016cv01021 |
Filed: |
July 14, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of California |
Office: |
Fresno Office |
County: |
Kern |
Presiding Judge: |
Dale A. Drozd |
Presiding Judge: |
Jennifer L. Thurston |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
July 25, 2018 |
Filing
45
STIPULATION and ORDER of DISMISSAL signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/25/2018. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
|
June 7, 2018 |
Filing
42
ORDER AFTER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2018. Stipulated dismissal due by 7/28/2018. All other pending dates, conferences and hearings, including the trial date, are VACATED. (Hall, S)
|
January 12, 2018 |
Filing
26
STIPULATION and ORDER 25 to Continue Trial and Pretrial Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/12/2018. Pretrial Conference CONTINUED to 4/30/2018 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 6/26/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
|
December 28, 2017 |
Filing
24
STIPULATION and ORDER 23 to Continue Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/28/2017. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 1/29/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
December 14, 2017 |
Filing
22
ORDER APPROVING 21 the Stipulation of the Parties and Continuing the Settlement Conference to January 4, 2018, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/14/2017. Settlement Conference CONTINUED to 1/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
|
August 31, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER GRANTING 17 Stipulation to Take the Deposition of Brian Bergmark Beyond the Discovery Deadline, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/31/2017. (Hall, S)
|
January 27, 2017 |
Filing
12
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER 11 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/27/2017. (Hall, S)
|
October 18, 2016 |
Filing
10
SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/18/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/13/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 11/4/2016; Non-Expert 7/24/2017; Expert 9/5/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set f or 7/24/2017 at 08:15 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 9/19/2017; Hearing by 10/17/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 11/3/2017; Hearing by 12/5/2017. Settlement Conference set for 9/11/2017 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Pretrial Conference set for 1/23/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial set for 3/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Hall, S)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?