Phanvongkham et al v. Moultrie
Plaintiff: Sisomphone Phanvongkham and Felicia Navarro
Defendant: Melissa Moultrie
Case Number: 1:2016cv01032
Filed: July 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER CONSTRUING Plaintiff's 14 Notice as a Motion for Reconsideration; ORDER DENYING Reconsideration signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/8/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REVOKING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS ON APPEAL re 18 USCA Order for Appeal No. 17-16458 signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/27/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/12/2017 recommending that 9 First Amended Complaint be dismissed. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill; Objections to F&R due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
December 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING Complaint WITH LEAVE TO AMEND, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 12/6/16. Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phanvongkham et al v. Moultrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sisomphone Phanvongkham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felicia Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Moultrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?