Frandsen v. City of Selma
Plaintiff: Shane Frandsen
Defendant: City of Selma
Case Number: 1:2016cv01048
Filed: July 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/15/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER. The non-expert discovery deadline is continued to 6/1/2017. The expert disclosure deadline is continued to 5/31/2017. The rebuttal expert disclosure deadline is continued to 6/14/2017. The expert discovery deadline is continued to 7/3/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/31/2017. (Timken, A)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/21/2017. (Timken, A)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/28/2017. (Rooney, M)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER regarding settlement conference procedures signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/10/2017. (Rooney, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frandsen v. City of Selma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shane Frandsen
Represented By: Michael A McGill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Selma
Represented By: Michael E Lehman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?