County of Kern v. Global Excel Management, Inc.
Plaintiff: County of Kern
Defendant: Global Excel Management, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01063
Filed: July 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER CLOSING CASE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/29/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Hall, S)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER APPROVING 22 Stipulation to Extend the Motion to Compel Deadline by Five Weeks, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/5/2017. Motion to compel due by 6/9/2017. (Hall, S)
April 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER GRANTING 20 Stipulation to Extend the Motion to Compel Deadline by Four Weeks, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/7/2017. Motion to compel due by 5/5/2017. (Hall, S)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER APPROVING 18 Stipulation to Extend the Motion to Compel Deadline by Two Weeks, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/21/2017. Motion to compel due by 4/7/2017. (Hall, S)
March 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER AFTER MID-DISCOVERY STATUS CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/14/2017. (Hall, S)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/28/2016. Pleading Amendment Deadline 1/13/2017. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures 11/1/2016; Non-Expert 8/14/2017; Expert 10/6/2017. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 3/6/2017 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield at 510 19th Street (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 10/20/2017; Hearing by 11/17/2017. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filed by 12/1/2017; Hearin g by 1/16/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Jury Trial set for 5/9/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (LJO) before Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: County of Kern v. Global Excel Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Excel Management, Inc.
Represented By: Dan D. Terzian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: County of Kern
Represented By: Karlene J. Rogers-Aberman
Represented By: Barry Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?