McRae v. Dikran et al
Plaintiff: Michael Scott McRae
Defendant: Bairamian Dikran, Kevin Cuohg Nguyen, Adrian Kumar and David Betz
Case Number: 1:2016cv01066
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER striking impermissible Surreply 92 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/2/2021. (Lundstrom, T)
January 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER for Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Defendant Nguyen Should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Effect Service signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/15/2021. Show Cause Response due within Thirty Days.(Sant Agata, S)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER PERMITTING Plaintiff Opportunity to Withdraw His Oppositions to Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment, and File Amended Oppositions in Light of RAND Notice, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 1/11/2021. **Filing Deadline: Thirty (30) days.** (Rivera, O)
October 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER Approving Parties' Stipulation to Modify Deadlines in Court's Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/2/2020. (Jessen, A)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING 75 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay as Moot signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 8/21/2020. (Jessen, A)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER DENYING 61 Motion for Reconsideration signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/12/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Judicial Notice 60 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 6/11/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Approving Parties' Stipulation to Extend Deadlines In Court's Scheduling Order 62 ; ORDER Extending Discovery Deadline and Deadline to File Dispositive Motions for all Parties, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/20/2020. ( Discovery due by 10/2/2020, Dispositive Motions filed by 12/2/2020) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 53 Request for Judicial Notice and his 54 Response to Opposition for Lack of Signature signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 5/1/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 45 Motion to Amend for Lack of Signature, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/27/2020. (Marrujo, C)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER STRIKING 39 DISCOVERY Document Improperly Filed With the Court, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/23/2020. (Marrujo, C)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DENYING 42 Motion for Appointment of Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/26/2020. (Rivera, O)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER extending Application of Discovery / Scheduling Order of December 2, 2019, to Defendant, Betz 35 signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/12/2019. (Lundstrom, T)
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER in Response to Plaintiff's 19 Objections Filed on September 27, 2018, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/1/18. (Marrujo, C)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that this Case be Dismissed, with Prejudice, for Failure to State a Claim signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 08/26/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 9/13/2018.(Flores, E)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DENYING 11 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 11/9/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 6 Motion for Summons Forms and Service of Defendants signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis L. Beck on 8/26/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McRae v. Dikran et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scott McRae
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bairamian Dikran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Cuohg Nguyen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adrian Kumar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Betz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?