Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2016cv01067
Filed: July 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/25/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
May 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING HEARING DATE AND GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO PROCEED ANONYMOUSLY, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/8/2017. (Kusamura, W)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 12 Plaintiff's Second Motion For Extension Of Time Within Which It Has To Serve Defendant With A Summons And Complaint. Plaintiff shall have until March 19, 2017, to effectuate service of a summons and complaint on Defendant. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/19/2016. (Thorp, J)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion 6 for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/25/2016. (Timken, A)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's First Motion for Extension of Time Within Which It Has To Serve Defendant With a Summons and Complaint 8 . Plaintiff shall have until December 21, 2016, to effectuate service of a summons and complaint on Defendant. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/20/2016. (Timken, A)
July 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FOURTH ORDER RELATING AND REASSIGNING CASES AND IMPOSING MONITARY SANCTIONS FOR PLAINTIFF'S THIRD FAILURE TO FILE NOTICE OF RELATED CASES signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 7/26/2016. (Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Malibu Media, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Malibu Media, LLC
Represented By: Henrik M. Mosesi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?