Moland et al v. City of Ceres et al
Plaintiff: Rosio Moland, Shon Moland and Mya Moland
Defendant: City of Ceres and Thomas Miller
Case Number: 1:2016cv01073
Filed: July 25, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Stanislaus
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER REMANDING CASE to Stanislaus County Superior Court Pursuant to Stipulation signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/7/2017. CASE CLOSED. Copy of remand order mailed to Stanislaus County Superior Court. (Jessen, A)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (Docs. 18 , 19 , 20 ) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/18/2017. Plaintiffs shall have twenty (20) days from electronic service of this Order to file an amended complaint or give notice that she will stand on the current pleading. (Jessen, A)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff an Extension of Time to File Opposition Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(B) signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/3/2017. (Jessen, A)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER to Extend Deadline to File Joint Status Report. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/29/2016, is CONTINUED to 2/23/2017, at 10:15 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. The parties shall file their joint scheduling report by no later than 2/16/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 11/22/2016. (Timken, A)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER GRANTING Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 4 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 10/17/16: 20-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moland et al v. City of Ceres et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosio Moland
Represented By: Dustin Jordan Dyer
Represented By: Michael Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shon Moland
Represented By: Dustin Jordan Dyer
Represented By: Michael Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mya Moland
Represented By: Dustin Jordan Dyer
Represented By: Michael Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Ceres
Represented By: Bradley J. Swingle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?