Adrian A. Woodard v. Wang

Plaintiff: Adrian Alexander Woodard
Defendant: Wang
Case Number: 1:2016cv01089
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendant's 22 Motion for Re-Screening; ORDER Requiring Response to First Amended Complaint and Request for Preliminary Injunction within Fourteen Days (14) of service of this order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2017. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
December 1, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 19 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint, and Screening Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/30/17. Defendant Wang's Answer Due Within 14-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 31, 2017 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER STRIKING Plaintiff's 17 Reply to Answer to Complaint filed by Adrian Alexander Woodard, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/31/17. (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Adrian A. Woodard v. Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Alexander Woodard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?