Anaya v. Vugt, et al.
Plaintiff: Peter Anaya
Defendant: R Van Vugt, G Gray, T Lucero and W S Wadkins
Case Number: 1:2016cv01094
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER dismissing action with prejudice as malicious and for Clerk to terminate all pending motions, close case and enter judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/17/2017. CASE CLOSED.(Lundstrom, T)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 28 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 08/28/2017. (Flores, E)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 22 26 Motions to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 07/10/2017. (Flores, E)
June 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 16 Motion for Injunctive Relief signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motions to Extend Time to File Second Amended Complaint re 14 , 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/6/17. Second Amended Complaint Due Within Thirty Days. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anaya v. Vugt, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Anaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Van Vugt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T Lucero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W S Wadkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?