Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Stacy Lynn Rodriguez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01106
Filed: July 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER for the Award and Payment of Attorney Fees and Expenses Pursuant to the Equal Access to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. 2412(d) and Costs Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1920, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/1/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING Entry of Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff, Stacy Lynn Rodriguez, and Against Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/156/2017: Accordingly, this Court GRANTS Pl aintiff's appeal against the Commissioner of Social Security IN PART. This action is REMANDED to the Commissioner for further administrative proceedings consistent with this opinion. The Clerk of this Court shall enter judgment in favor of Plaintiff, Stacy Lynn Rodriguez, and against Nancy A. Berryhill, Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this action.(CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Sanctions Should Not Be Imposed for a Failure to Comply With This Court's Order signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 4/20/2017. Show Cause Response due within twenty (20) days. (Jessen, A)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE OPENING BRIEF signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/17/2017: Pursuant to the parties' stipulation (Doc. 12 ), Plaintiff's request for an extension of time to file the opening brief is granted nunc pro tunc. Plaintiff shall file her opening brief no later than April 12, 2017. All other dates in the scheduling order issued on July 29, 2016 (Doc. 3 ) are modified accordingly. (Valdez, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Lynn Rodriguez
Represented By: Denise Bourgeois Haley
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ben A. Porter, GOVT
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?