Kerzich v County of Tuolumne
Plaintiff: Mark Kerzich and Timothy Wertz
Defendant: County of Tuolumne
Case Number: 1:2016cv01116
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER APPROVING Revised FLSA 71 Settlement and Dismissing Action With Prejudice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/18/19. CASE CLOSED. (Marrujo, C)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Requiring Parties to File a Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement or Notice that Matter has not Settled signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/06/2018. Filing Deadline: 10/29/2018.(Flores, E)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for September 5, 2018 at 10:00 am before Judge McAuliffe), signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/28/2018. PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. (Valdez, E)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF FLSA SETTLEMENT, 58 . Plaintiffs' motion for approval of this FLSA settlement (Doc. No. 58) is denied without prejudice to the parties attempting to settle this action in a manner that remedies the deficiencies identified. The case is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further scheduling. Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/13/2018. (Timken, A)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Directing Further Briefing, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/6/2018. (Plaintiffs are granted 28 days from the date of service of this order to file and serve a supplemental memorandum in support of its motion for approval addressing the court's questions as well as any other matters that may aid the court in resolution of the pending motion.)(Gaumnitz, R)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Action as to Plaintiff's Sharon Beuttler, Lynda Johnson, and Elizabeth Nadolny only signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/24/2018. (Flores, E)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT OF COLLECTIVE ACTION. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for preliminary approval of the collective action settlement shall be filed on or before February 2, 2018; and a hearing shall be set before District Judge Dale A. Drodz pursuant to the Local Rules of the Eastern District of California. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/23/2018. (Hernandez, M)
August 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO AMEND SCHEDULING ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the November 1, 2016 scheduling order is AMENDED as follows: Deadline for expert disclosure: October 11, 2017; Deadline for supplemental expert disclosure: October 30, 2017; Deadline to complete expert discovery: November 13, 2017; All other aspects of the November 1, 2016 scheduling order remain in effect. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/22/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Regarding Settlement Conference (set for October 2, 2017 at 9:30 am before Judge McAuliffe). PERSONAL Appearance by Plaintiff and Defense Counsel Required. signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/18/2017. (Herman, H)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/9/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting 37 Stipulation for Conditional Certification and Approval of Class Notice, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/24/2017. (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerzich v County of Tuolumne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Kerzich
Represented By: Jason H Jasmine
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Wertz
Represented By: Jason H Jasmine
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tuolumne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?