Burell v. Lozovoy et al
Plaintiff: Angee Burell
Defendant: Ruslan Lozovoy, Jeff Sao, S. Bozarth, M. Spaeth and Karen Brown
Case Number: 1:2016cv01118
Filed: August 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER Regarding Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 50 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/9/2019. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation Substituting California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation as Sole Defendant and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Terminate Defendants Lozovoy and Sao From This Action, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 48 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/27/2019. (Hellings, J)
January 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Stay 46 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/30/3019. (Hellings, J)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER That Inmate Angee Burrell is No Longer Needed as a Witness in These Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 10/3/2018. (Hellings, J)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Angee Burrell, CDC #T-48872, Plaintiff Witness on October 3, 2018 at 9:30 a.m., before Magistrate McAuliffe, Courtroom #8, 6th Floor, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/5/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 7/17/2018: Settlement Conference set for 9/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Hellings, J)
July 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR and Staying Case for 120 Days,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/11/18. (Settlement Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe) (30-Day Deadline) (Case Management Deadline: 120-Day Deadline) CASE STAYED (Martin-Gill, S)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER ADOPTING 26 Findings and Recommendations and Dismissing Certain Defendants, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/20/18. (Marrujo, C)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that This action proceed on Plaintiffs claim for deliberate indifference to a serious medical need in violation of the Eighth Amendment Defendants Lozovoy and Sao, and for retaliation in violation of the Firs t Amendment against, Defendant Sao; all other claims and defendants be dismissed for failure to state a claim re 23 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint filed by Angee Burrell ; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/7/17. Objections to F&R due by 12/26/2017 (Martin-Gill, S)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DENYING 19 Request to Withdraw Amended Complaint to Add Missing Pages and Argument, as MOOT signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/26/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel, Without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Correct Plaintiff's Name 11 ; ORDER Re-Captioning Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/10/17. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burell v. Lozovoy et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angee Burell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruslan Lozovoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Sao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Bozarth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Spaeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?