Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: James Diaz
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01127
Filed: July 30, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES UNDER THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d). ORDER DENYING AS MOOT PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff is awarded attorney fees in the amount of $6,195.28 pursuant to the stipulation of the parties. Plaintiffs motion for attorney fees (ECF No. 27) is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/19/2017. (Hernandez, M)
December 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR ATTORNEY FEES AND EXPENSES PURSUANT TO THE EQUAL ACCESS TO JUSTICE ACT, 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d) 27 . Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants opposition to the motion for attorney fees shall be filed on or before December 26, 2017; and Any reply by Plaintiff shall be filed on or before January 2, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting In Part Plaintiff's Social Security Appeal and Remanding Matter for Further Administrative Proceedings, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/8/17. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER RE SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before July 27, 2017; Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before August 11, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RE STIPULATION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINITFF'S OPENING BRIEF. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendant shall file a response to Plaintiffs opening brief on or before July 20, 2017; and Plaintiffs reply, if any, shall be filed on or before August 4, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/20/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE (ECF No. 13 ) signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2017: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff shall have a first extension of time of thirty (30) days, up to and including March 23, 2017, to serve his confidential letter brief. All other deadlines set forth in the Scheduling Order (ECF Doc. 5 ) are modified accordingly. (Valdez, E)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE NOTICE OF STATUS OF SERVICE. TEN DAY DEADLINE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a notice within ten (10) days informing the Court of the status of service on Defendant in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/8/2016. (Hernandez, M)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue Summons signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/2/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Diaz
Represented By: Melissa Newel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?