Silva v. Worth et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Silva
Defendant: J. Worth and N. Green
Case Number: 1:2016cv01131
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER on Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice and Directing Clerk of the Court to Close Case signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/25/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Following Settlement; VACATING Dates and DIRECTING Parties to File Dispositive Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice 60 Plaintiff's Motion for Early Discovery and ORDER Disregarding As Moot 61 Plaintiff's Motion Regarding Court-Supervised Settlement Conference signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/15/2019. (Jessen, A)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Anthony Silva, CDCR# K-82438, Plaintiff on June 7, 2019 at 9:30 a.m., Fresno, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/2/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING 52 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and STRIKING Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint 43 , 46 , 51 , 52 , 53 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 4/17/2019. (14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Strike Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/6/19. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty One Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER DENYING without prejudice 49 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/12/19. (Response to OSC due 14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why the First Amended Complaint Should Not Be Stricken From the Record Based on Plaintiff's Failure to Comply With the California Government Claims Act 43 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/14/2019: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting Defendant's 44 Request to screen Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/3/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting Defendants' 36 Motion and striking Plaintiff's "Joint Case Management Statement and Request Proposed Order 35 " signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/29/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that This Action be DISMISSED, Without Prejudice, for Plaintiff's Failure to Exhaust Available Administrative Remedies Prior to Filing Suit re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/12/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Jessen, A)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR FAILINGTO EXHAUST ADMINISTRATIVE REMEDIES PRIOR TO FILING SUIT signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/5/2017. Show Cause Response due by 6/30/2017.(Lundstrom, T)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss 1 Action without Prejudice for Failure to Obey a Court Order and to Pay Filing Fee or File Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; 30-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 1/11/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Sant Agata, S)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the action should not be dismissed for Plaintiff's failure to comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/2/2016. Show Cause Response due (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silva v. Worth et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Silva
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Worth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?