Martinez v. County of Tulare et al
Plaintiff: Maria Eva Martinez
Defendant: County of Tulare and San Diego County
Case Number: 1:2016cv01140
Filed: August 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tulare
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Directing Clerk to Close Case 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/27/17: Plaintiff has voluntarily dismissed this action with prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). The Court therefore DIRECTS the Clerk to close this case. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 6/26/2017. (Timken, A)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER VACATING Mid-Discovery Status Conference and MODIFYING the Court's Scheduling Order. The Court modifies the scheduling order as follows: Non-Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/6/2017. Non-Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 10/4/2017. Dispositive Motions shall be filed by 9/27/2017. Dispositive Motions shall be heard by 11/7/2017. Settlement Conference is set for 8/10/2017, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Pretri al Conference is set for 1/22/2018, at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. Jury Trial is set for 3/20/2018, at 01:00 PM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. The Court VACATES the Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 4/13/2017. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/10/2017. (Timken, A)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER on AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/5/2017. (Timken, A)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Denying Defendant San Diego Countys Motion to Dismiss And Motion to Transfer, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/3/2017. (1. Defendant San Diego County's 30 motion to dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer is denied; and 2. Defendant San Diego County's 33 motion to stay discovery pending the court's ruling on the motion to dismiss is dismissed as having been rendered moot by this order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
March 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice Stipulated Protective Order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/28/2017. (Timken, A)
February 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER TO CONTINUE DISCOVERY DEADLINES. Amend Pleadings: 5/1/2017. Non-Expert Discovery Deadline: 6/23/2017. Expert Disclosures: 6/23/2017. Rebuttal Expert Disclosures: 6/28/2017. Expert Discovery Deadline: 7/21/2017. Mid-Dis covery Status Conference set for 4/13/2017, at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Mid-Discovery Status Report shall be filed by no later than 4/6/2017. The non-dispositive motion deadlines, dispositive motio n deadlines, pretrial conference, and trial dates are hereby VACATED and shall be set at the Mid-Discovery Status Conference on April 13, 2017. In their Mid-Discovery Status Report, the parties shall propose dates for these events that are agreed to by all counsel. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/14/2017. (Thorp, J)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER GRANTING 31 EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR AN ORDER SHORTENING TIME TO HEAR MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY PENDING COURTS RULING ON MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE TO CHANGE VENUE. Defendant Count y of San Diego shall file its motion to stay discovery within two (2) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff Maria Eva Martinez's opposition to Defendant County of San Diego's motion to stay discovery is due to be filed and se rved by February 22, 2017. Defendant County of San Diego's reply is waived. The hearing on Defendant County of San Diego's motion to stay discovery is set for March 1, 2017, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/8/2017. (Thorp, J)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Correcting Clerical Error and Reopening Case to Resolve Maria Eva Martinez's Claims Against the County of San Diego signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 01/29/2017. (Flores, E)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Entering Judgment in Favor of Plaintiff Maria Eva Martinez and Against Defendant County of Tulare signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/17/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING Defendant San Diego County's 7 Motion to Dismiss, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/14/2016. (The matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for purposes of conducting a conference and issuing a scheduling order.) (Gaumnitz, R)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER Allowing Defendant, Tulare County to File an Amended Answer to Complaint. Defendant County of Tulare shall file its Amended Answer, a copy of which was attached to the stipulation (Doc. 10), within two (2) calendar days of the date this Order is filed. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/22/2016. (Timken, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. County of Tulare et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Eva Martinez
Represented By: Caitlin Sinclaire Blythe
Represented By: Arturo Jorge Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Tulare
Represented By: Judith Diane Chapman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego County
Represented By: Erica Brown Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?