Mitchell v. Davey, et al.
Plaintiff: John E. Mitchell
Defendant: D. Davey, M.S. Robicheaux, Thompson, J. Vargas, J. Huewe, B. Tenorio, Alford and H. Baeza
Case Number: 1:2016cv01148
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to Close the Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 9/30/2020. CASE CLOSED. (Rivera, O)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/23/2020 ORDERING Defense Counsel to serve Plaintiff with a copy of the settlement agreement and file proof of service with the court within 7 days of the date of this Order. (Henshaw, R)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for John E. Mitchell, CDCR #H-38255 to Appear Telephonically for Settlement Conference on September 9, 2020 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/14/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER ADOPTING 169 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 156 Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief Under the All Writs Act signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/3/2020. (Jessen, A)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 06/09/2020. (Flores, E)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 156 Motion for an Order under the All Writs Act be Denied without Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/08/2020. Referred to Judge Drozd; Objections to F&R due within Twenty-One Days. (Flores, E)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference; ORDER Directing Clerk to Serve a Copy of this Order on the Litigation Coordinator at Mule Creek State Prison signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 06/08/2020. Settlement Conference set for 9/9/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Flores, E)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER ADOPTING in Part 154 Findings and Recommendations, DENYING Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Summary Judgment, Denying Defendant's 130 Motion for Summary Judgment, and Denying Plaintiff's Miscellaneous Motions signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 05/19/2020. (Flores, E)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 161 Motion for Copies and Docket Sheet; ORDER Directing Clerk to Send Plaintiff 1) a Copy of the Docket Sheet 2) a Copy of the Supplemental Pleading Lodged on June 6, 2019 and 3) a Copy of the Supplemental Pleading Lodged on February 7, 2020 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 05/13/2020. (Flores, E)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER Vacating Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing, Trial, and Related Deadlines signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/14/2020. (Flores, E)
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's 128 Motion for Summary Judgment be Granted and that Defendant's 130 Motion for Summary Judgment be Denied; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS on Miscellaneous 112 135 136 141 143 147 148 Motions; ORDER Denying Defendant's 149 Request for Ruling as Moot and Requiring Defendant to Serve Plaintiff with a Copy of her Responses to Plaintiff's Discovery Requests signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 03/27/2020. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due by within Twenty-One Days. (Flores, E)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER re: Plaintiff's Request for filing/action or ruling on Supplemental Complaint 151 signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/4/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER Re: Plaintiff's Notice of Withdrawal of All Discovery Motions re 120 , 123 , 124 & 129 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/27/19. (Gonzalez, R)
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 101 Motion for Enlargement of Discovery Request, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/15/19. (Marrujo, C)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Subpoenas Duces Tecum, Without Prejudice 99 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/6/2019. (Hellings, J)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Adopting 86 91 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/17/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 91 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending that Defendant Thompson's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to Exhaust be Granted 88 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/6/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 86 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Claims Consistent With Magistrate Judge's Prior Order in Light of Williams Decision 16 & 26 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/2/2018: 14-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Joinder of Claims Without Prejudice 79 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
April 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER DENYING Without Prejudice 72 Request for Ruling by District Judge on Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 4/20/18. (Marrujo, C)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER DENYING 61 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment and/or Relief from Order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/30/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 60 Motion to Withdraw Notice of Appeal and Directing Clerk to Send the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit a Copy of this Order and Plaintiff's Motion signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/28/2017. (Flores, E)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Adopting 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; VACATING 6 Order Granting Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and REVOKING Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status; REQUIRING Plaintiff to PAY Filing Fee; DIRECTING Clerk to Serve this Order on Court Financial Department and the Director of the California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/4/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS, Recommending That Defendant's 33 Motion for an Order Revoking Plaintiff's In Forma Pauperis Status be Granted and That Plaintiff be Given Forty-Five Days to Pay the Filing Fee, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/1/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER DENYING Motion for Order Under the All Writs Act, or in the Alternative, for Appointment of Counsel 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/22/17. (Hellings, J)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw Motions for Injunctive Relief and DENYING Motion for Injunction Directed at the Warden of R.J. Donovan Correctional Facility 8 , 15 , 19 , and 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/24/17. (Hellings, J)
December 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER for Office of the Attorney General to Address Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration 15 , signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/20/16. 14-Day Deadline. (cc: Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson). (Verduzco, M)
November 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 8 Motion for an Interlocutory Order Under the All Writs Act as Moot, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/10/16. (Verduzco, M)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER for Office of the Attorney General to Address Plaintiff's Motion for an Interlocutory Order under the all writs act; 14-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 10/13/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Submit Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/17/16. Forty-Five Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Davey, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John E. Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Davey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.S. Robicheaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Vargas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Huewe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Tenorio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. Baeza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?