Publius v. Boyer-Vine
Plaintiff: Doe Publius
Defendant: Diane F. Boyer-Vine
Case Number: 1:2016cv01152
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATED JUDGMENT signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/9/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 26 Motion to proceed anonymously ; Parties shall file a joint status report informing Court how they wish to proceed, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/9/17. (Deadline: May 31, 2017) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER re 19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 2/27/2017. (Status Report due by 3/10/2017). (Lundstrom, T)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Approving Parties' Stipulation to Amendment Nunc Pro Tunc, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/2/2016. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SEALING Exhibit A to the Complaint (Doc. [1-1]), signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 8/5/2016. (Pending further order of the Court, Document 1-1 (Exhibit A to the Complaint) is ordered SEALED, as it contains content and subject matter the privacy of which is at the heart of this lawsuit. The Clerk of Court is directed to separate Exhibit A from the remainder of the Complaint and docket Exhibit A only as a separate docket entry UNDER SEAL.) (Gaumnitz, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Publius v. Boyer-Vine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doe Publius
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Represented By: Stephen M. Duvernay
Represented By: Eugene Volokh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane F. Boyer-Vine
Represented By: Fredric D. Woocher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?