Perez v. Valley Garlic, Inc., et al.

Plaintiff: Thomas E Perez
Defendant: Valley Garlic, Inc., Christian Barrere Marrione, David Clark Anderson, X-Treme Ag Labor, Inc., Isabella Alvarez Camacho, Ofelia Ramirez Morales and Cesar Neri
Case Number: 1:2016cv01156
Filed: August 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Referring Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 29:1801
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 99 CONSENT JUDGMENT and ORDER as to Defendants Valley Garlic, Inc.; Christian Barrere Marrione; and David Clark Anderson, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 4/2/18. CASE CLOSED. (Gonzalez, R)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 95 STIPULATION and ORDER CONTINUING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the settlement conference scheduled for March 19, 2018, at 2:30 p.m. is continued to March 28, 2018, at 1:30 p.m. If the parties arrive at a settlement before March 28, 2018, the parties shall file their notice of settlement on the docket. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/19/2018. (Timken, A)
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 CONSENT JUDGMENT and ORDER as to Defendants X-TREME Ag Labor, Inc. and Isabella Alvarez Camacho, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/9/18. (Gonzalez, R)
January 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER granting 70 Motion for Reconsideration and Lifting Stay as to Defendants, Camacho and X-Treme AG signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 1/2/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 12/21/2017. (Timken, A)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 58 Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants Ofelia Ramirez Morales and Cesar Neri, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 8/23/17. (Marrujo, C)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING the extension of the following deadlines: Non-Expert Discovery due by 12/22/2017; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/22/2018; Rebuttal Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/21/2018; Expert Discovery due by 3/23/2018; Dispositi ve Motions filed by 5/7/2018; Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii; Jury Trial set for 11/6/2018 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/15/2017. (Rooney, M)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER DENYING 43 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/11/2017. (Kusamura, W)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 34 Second Motion for Preliminary Injunction, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/27/2017. (Kusamura, W)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION 7 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/18/2016. (Kusamura, W)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting continuance of hearing signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/3/2016. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Valley Garlic, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E Perez
Represented By: Benjamin Richard Botts, GOVT
Represented By: Jessica Maria Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valley Garlic, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Barrere Marrione
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Clark Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: X-Treme Ag Labor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Alvarez Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofelia Ramirez Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Neri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?