Leprino Foods Company v. JND Thomas Company, Inc., et al.
Plaintiff: Leprino Foods Company
Defendant: JND Thomas Company, Inc. and Dennis Thomas
Case Number: 1:2016cv01181
Filed: August 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT as to Defendant: Dennis Thomas; ORDER that Judgment be Issued Against Defendant JND Thomas Company, Inc.; ORDER DIRECTING that the Case be Closed, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/24/2017. CASE CLOSED(Martin-Gill, S)
May 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 24 Motion for Default Judgment Against Dennis Thomas; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff 14 Days Leave to Amend the Complaint, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 05/02/2017. (14-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Requiring Plaintiff to File a Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 39 ) TWO DAY DEADLINE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/10/2017. It is hereby ordered that within two (2) days of the date of entry of this order, Plaintiff shall file a second amended complaint that complies with Local Rule 220; and if Plaintiff fails to comply with this order, this action will proceed on the first amended complaint. (Valdez, E)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER VACATING MARCH 8, 2017 HEARING AND GRANTING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT 31 . Plaintiff shall file the second amended complaint within four days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/17/2017. (Hernandez, M)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER re 30 & 31 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/31/17. (Marrujo, C)
January 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. These findings and recommendations are submitted to the district judge assigned to this action. Within 14 days of service, any party may file written objections. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER RE SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff shall file supplemental briefing on or before January 6, 2017, addressing Colorado law as it applies to the claims in this action; why Colorado law would not apply to the claims against Defendant Thomas; and Plaintiffs theory of individual liability for Defendant Thomas citing relevant authority. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/29/2016. (Valdez, E)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DISCHARGING 19 Order to Show Cause and GRANTING Plaintiff's Request to File Supplemental Declarations and Evidence; December 23, 2016 Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COMPLAINT SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED AND ADDRESSING DEFICIENCIES IN PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause in writing within five (5) days why the complaint filed August 10, 2016, should not be dismissed with leave to amend for failure to allege diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/12/2016. (Hernandez, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leprino Foods Company v. JND Thomas Company, Inc., et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JND Thomas Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leprino Foods Company
Represented By: Patrick T. Markham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?