Brasher v. Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sherri Brasher
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01185
Filed: August 10, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Madera
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting 23 24 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 09/05/2018. CASE CLOSED.(Flores, E)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Vacating Final Pretrial Conference set for December 4, 2017, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 10/31/2017. (Flores, E)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER RE Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's 23 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 10/30/2017. Response due by 11/27/2017; Reply due by 12/11/2017.(Flores, E)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 8/25/17. The parties shall conduct the aforementioned depositions no later than September 30, 2017. (Marrujo, C)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER Granting 19 Motion to Extend Non-Expert Discovery Cut-Off signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 07/19/2017. (Flores, E)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 AMENDED ORDER 16 , signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/4/17: Telephonic conference for Tuesday, January 17, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. Mountain Standard Time in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Hellings, J)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, signed by Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee on 1/4/17: Telephonic Conference set for 1/17/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 401, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee. (Hellings, J)
October 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Amending Rule 16 Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/24/2016. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2017 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 401, Phoenix, Arizona before Senior Judge Stephen M. McNamee.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brasher v. Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerigas Propane, Inc.
Represented By: Michele Beilke
Represented By: Zaher Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherri Brasher
Represented By: John L Migliazzo
Represented By: Michael J. F. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?