Millner v. Woods et al
Plaintiff: James W. Millner
Defendant: Woods and Hashem
Case Number: 1:2016cv01209
Filed: August 15, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER DENYING 46 Plaintiff's Motion for an Impartial Dental Expert Witness; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants' Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/19. Thirty Day Deadline.(Marrujo, C)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Adopting 51 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/19/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint and DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Randomly ASSIGN District Judge signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/8/2019. Referred to Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill. Objections to F&R due within Twenty-One Days. (Sant Agata, S)
November 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER STRIKING 49 Plaintiff's Reply to Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/19/2018. (Jessen, A)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE 38 Motion for Summary Judgment ; ORDER DENYING, WITHOUT PREJUDICE 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; ORDER DENYING AS PREMATURE 42 Motion for Jury Trial, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/28/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Extending Discovery and Scheduling Order to Defendant Dr. Hashem 24 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2018. (Hellings, J)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER GRANTING Defendant Hashem's Motion to Set Aside Entry if Default, Directing Clerk of Court to Vacate Entry of Default, and Directing Defendant Hashem to File an Answer to Complaint Within 10 Days From the Date of Service of This Order 27 , 31 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/5/2018. (Hellings, J)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 29 Motion for hearing to determine amount of damages owed due to default judgment, without prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/5/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
November 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting 26 Request for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Hashem signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/15/2017. (Lundstrom, T)
October 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER as to why Entry of Default should not be entered as to Defendant Hashem,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/27/17. (30-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Discharging 18 Order to Show Cause and Denying Request for Extension of Time re 21 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/22/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Hashem should not be DISMISSED from this action for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/1/17. Show Cause Response due 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
August 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER PARTIALLY VACATING ORDER 14 Directing United States Marshal to Serve Defendants Woods and Hasheem; SERVICE OF PROCESS REMAINS in full force and effect as to Hashem, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/28/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's Motions to Have the U.S. Marshal Serve Defendants Woods and Hasheem re 11 , 12 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/23/17. (Gonzalez, R)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Serve Complaint on Defendants within Ninety Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER FINDING Service of First Amended Complaint Appropriate as to Defendants Woods and Hashem signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/5/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Millner v. Woods et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James W. Millner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hashem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?