Wright et al v. Tehachapi Unified School District
Plaintiff: Buddy Wright and Amy Wright
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Case Number: 1:2016cv01214
Filed: August 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J. O'Neill
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L. Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER GRANTING 83 Defendant's Motion for Reconsideration, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/5/2020. Motion hearing set for 6/8/2020 is VACATED. (Hall, S)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER GRANTING 75 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/24/2020. (Hall, S)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER GRANTING 73 Plaintiff's Proposed Daily Interest Calculation, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 4/1/2020. (Hall, S)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING 63 Motion to Enforce Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/18/2020. (Hall, S)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs' Request for Fees and Costs, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/4/2017. (Hall, S)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER DENYING 45 Plaintiff's Request to File a Second Reply Brief, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 8/1/2017. (Hall, S)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING 23 Request to File Administrative Record Under Seal, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/31/2017. (Hall, S)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Assigning Action to U.S. Magistrate Judge For All Purposes Pursuant to the Consent of All Parties, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 3/30/17. (Marrujo, C)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/23/2017. Consent/Decline Deadline 4/3/2017. Pleading Amendment Deadline 5/1/2017. Adminstrative Record Deadlines: Filing by 3/31/2017; Objections by 4/14/2017. Merits Briefing: Opening Brief by 4/28/2017; Response by 5/26/2017; Reply by 6/16/2017. (Hall, S)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/10/2017. (Thorp, J)
February 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation for a Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/9/2017. Settlement Conference set for 2/24/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO), Fresno, before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Hall, S)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: INFORMAL DISCOVERY; ORDER REFERRING THE MATTER TO VDRP, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/15/2016. Case REFERRED to VDRP. The process of selecting the neutral SHALL not begin until 12/16/2016 to allow the informal discovery to be completed. (Hall, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright et al v. Tehachapi Unified School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buddy Wright
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amy Wright
Represented By: Andrea Moore Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tehachapi Unified School District
Represented By: Elizabet Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?