Smith v. Hernandez et al
Plaintiff: Delbert J. Smith
Defendant: C. Hernandez, J. Brown, N. Gonzales, J. Beard, Zuniga and J. Jacobo-Tapia
Case Number: 1:2016cv01267
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER Regarding Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 113 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/8/2019. (CASE CLOSED)(Hellings, J)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER Setting Telephonic Trial Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/6/2019: Telephonic Trial Scheduling Hearing set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone.(Hellings, J)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER Regarding Defendants Hernandez and Flores-Alvarenga to Consent to, Decline to, or Withhold Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Within Fourteen (14) Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/28/2019. (Hellings, J)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Adopting 92 Findings and Recommendations, Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief 63 , and Granting Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment 92 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 1/25/19. (Gonzalez, R)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 92 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's Motion for Injunctive Relief 63 ; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Defendants' Amended Motion for Summary Judgment 86 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/26/2018: 30-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Motion to Strike Motion for Summary Judgment 85 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/7/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Local Co-Counsel 78 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/1/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Striking Plaintiff's Reply to Answer 72 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/30/2018. (Hellings, J)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER ADOPTING 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS AND DISMISSING CERTAIN CLAIMS, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 07/9/2018. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER Regarding 60 Motion to Withdraw Demand for Jury Trial and Continue to Trial by Assigned Judge in this Civil Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/4/18. (Gonzalez, R)
April 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER REGARDING 44 Notice of Submission of Document in Accord with September 27, 2017 Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/2/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER that Inmate Delbert J. Smith is no Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is DISCHARGED signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/23/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
February 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Plaintiff Delbert J. Smith, CDCR# F-78037 for Settlement Conference on March 23, 2018 at 9:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/22/2018. (Flores, E)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/19/2018 setting Settlement Conference for 3/23/2018 at 09:00 AM at California State Prison-Corcoran before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng.(Lundstrom, T) .
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 48 Motion to Receive Court Appointed Lawyer in the Interest of Justice, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/15/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting Defendants' 45 Motion to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/29/17. (Gonzalez, R)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Certain Claims and Defendants be DISMISSED re 32 First Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/9/2017. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER Granting Defendants' 39 Request for Clarification of Court Order Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/6/17. (Gonzalez, R)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 31 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/26/17. (Gonzalez, R)
July 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER Granting In Part and Denying In Part Plaintiff's 18 Motion to File First Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/17/17. Thirty Day Deadline. (Marrujo, C)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 25 Motion for Copies, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/9/17. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Hernandez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Beard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuniga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Jacobo-Tapia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?