Consiglio v. Brown et al
Plaintiff: Sam Consiglio, Jr.
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown, Pamela Ahlin and Audrey King
Case Number: 1:2016cv01268
Filed: August 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Regarding In Forma Pauperis Status on Appeal 88 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/20/19. (Gonzalez, R)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ADOPTING 75 Findings and Recommendations, GRANTING Without Leave to Amend Defendants' 67 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, and DISMISSING the Instant Action with Prejudice signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/26/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 81 Motion for Punitive Sanctions Against Defendants for Frivolous and Vexatious Motions signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/25/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 78 Motion for Punitive Sanctions Against Defendants for Commission of Willful Perjury and Granting in Part and Denying as Moot in Part Defendants' 79 Motion for Protective Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/19. (Gonzalez, R)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Grant Without Leave to Amend Defendants' 67 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and to Deny Plaintiff's Request for Sanctions re 73 , 74 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/17/19. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File a Response to Defendants' Ex Parte Motion to Modify Rule 28 and Defendants' Amended Ex Parte Motion to Modify Rule 28 68 , 69 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/26/2019: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Regarding Plaintiff's 61 Notice of Appeal of Magistrate Judge's Refusal to Grant Request for Appointment of Counsel, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/25/19. (Marrujo, C)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 64 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/24/19. (Gonzalez, R)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Request for Appointment of Counsel 59 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/5/2018. (Hellings, J)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Requiring Defendants to File an Answer on or Before September 20, 2018 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 09/07/2018. (Flores, E)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS 47 , 48 ; ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Defendant Ahlin and Brown's Motion to Dismiss 16 ; ORDER DENYING Defendant Price's Motion to Dismiss 26 ; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Mo tion for a Temporary Restraining Order and to Halt the Destruction of Property 31 , 36 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/6/2018: This matter is referred back to the Magistrate Judge for further proceedings consistent with this order. (Hellings, J)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiffs motion for a temporary restraining order, filed on February 2, 2018 (ECF No. 31) be denied ;Plaintiffs motion for a court order to halt the destruction and discarding of patient property, filed on February 22, 2018 (ECF No. 36), be denied; referred to Judge Ishii,signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/24/2018. Objections to F&R due by 8/27/2018 (Martin-Gill, S)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending That Defendant Ahlin and Brown's Motion to Dismiss be Granted In Part, and That Defendant Price's Motion to Dismiss be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Thirty Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's Second 34 Motion to Appoint Counsel, without Prejudice; ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Provide Copies, and Granting Plaintiff Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 02/23/2018. Thirty-Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
January 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Second 29 Request for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/25/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 SUA SPONTE ORDER regarding Substitution of Party sued in their official capacity; Brandon Price substituted for Audrey King, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/6/17. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, DISMISSING Certain Claims and Defendants for the Failure to State a Claim 10 , signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 6/27/17. (Hellings, J)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADOPTING 7 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 5/25/2017. (Jessen, A)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss Certain Claims; Fourteen-Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/28/2017. Referred to Judge Anthony W. Ishii. Objections to F&R due by 5/18/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Request for Preliminary Injunction be DENIED re 1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/7/2017. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING Motion to Proceed IFP 2 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/29/16. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consiglio v. Brown et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Consiglio, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?