Jacques v. Lopez, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Michael Jacques
Defendant: J. Lopez, Jr., T. Vasquez, P. Athie and J. Garza
Case Number: 1:2016cv01289
Filed: August 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Stanley A. Boone
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER re 53 Notice Regarding PLRA Deductions, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/29/2020. (Rivera, O)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER regarding Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) 50 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/23/2019. CASE CLOSED. (Lundstrom, T)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER ADOPTING 43 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' 37 Motion for Summary Judgment ; This matter shall now proceed only on plaintiffs Eighth Amendment claims for excessive force against defen dants Athie, Garza, Lopez, and Razo, and for failure to intervene against defendant Vasquez; ORDERED that Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendant Aro ; This matter is referred back to assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/30/2019. (Martin-Gill, S)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Defendants Vasquez's, Athie's, Aro's, Garza's, Razo's and Lopez's Motion for Summary Judgment 37 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/2/19. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within 21-Days. (Gonzalez, R)
January 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to FILE Opposition or Statement of Non-Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Twenty-One (21) Day Deadline signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/17/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for Michael Jacques, CDC #AX-5885 on October 18, 2018 at 1:30 p.m., before Magistrate Judge Kendall, Courtroom 25, Sacramento, CA, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/18/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for an Order for Deposition Upon Written Questions 20 , 21 , 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/21/2018. (Hellings, J)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Setting Settlement Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/17/2018: Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman.(Hellings, J)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Requiring Response to Motion for an Order Regarding Deposition Upon Written Questions 20 , 21 , 22 , signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/24/2018: 7-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Adopting 9 Findings and Recommendations, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 8/4/17. K. Joseph (Correctional Investigative Service Unit Agent), S. Monge (Correctional Officer), D. Barrios (Registered Nurse) and J. Gonzalez (Correctional Officer) terminated. (Gonzalez, R)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Submit Copies of the Endorsed Complaint Filed on August 31, 2016 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/14/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jacques v. Lopez, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Jacques
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lopez, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Athie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Garza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?