Laneley v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Randy Laneley
Defendant: E. Garcia, G. Cook and Tulare County Sheriff Dept
Case Number: 1:2016cv01299
Filed: September 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum for Telephonic Appearance of Randy Langley, signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 05/9/2022.(Martin-Gill, S)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for (TELEPHONIC) Appearance of Randy Langley on May 12, 2022 at 10:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 04/12/2022.(Martin-Gill, S)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER CONTINUING Trial and SETTING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/21/2021. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 5/12/2022 at 10:00 AM. Jury Trial CONTINUED to 6/13/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Rivera, O)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM for TELEPHONE APPEARANCE OF RANDY LANGLEY, Telephone Appearance on August 30, 2021 at 9:00 am before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 08/12/2021. (Maldonado, C)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER Discharging Order to Show Cause; ORDER Continuing Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing and Trial signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 06/25/2021. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 8/30/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 11/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Flores, E)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiff's Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, EXTENDING Deadline to Respond to 72 Order to Show Cause, and CONTINUING Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/7/2021. Show Cause Response due within 21 days. 6/14/2021 Trial Confirmation Hearing is CONTINUED to 7/14/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Rivera, O)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed for Failure to Comply With the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 05/18/2021. Show Cause Response Due By 6/4/2021. (Maldonado, C)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 68 Motion for Summary Judgment or Judgment as a Matter of Law, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/8/2020. (Marrujo, C)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ADOPTING 59 Findings and Recommendations and ORDER DENYING 52 Motion for Summary Judgment; case is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/1/2020. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Defendants' 52 Motion for Summary Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/26/2020. Referred to Judge Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within Twenty-One (21) Days. (Sant Agata, S)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to Submit Supplement to Motion for Summary Judgment, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/19/2020. Defendants Shall Lodge Videos with the Court Within 14 days. (Rivera, O)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 40 & 42 Requests for Reasonable Expenses, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/30/2020. (Marrujo, C)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DENYING 41 Motion to Compel and DIRECTING Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE Why Award of Expenses Should Not Be Imposed, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/7/2020. Show Cause by 2/14/2020. (Orozco, A)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER GRANTING 43 Motion to Stay signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2019. Case Management Deadline: 4/30/2020. (Lundstrom, T)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AMENDING Discovery and Scheduling Order re 37 signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/18/2019. Discovery Cut-Off: 9/16/2019. Dispositive Motion Deadline: 11/19/2019. (Jessen, A)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DENYING 33 Motion to Compel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/22/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 AMENDED ORDER REFERRING CASE to Post-Screening ADR Project and STAYING the Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/6/2018. (Sant Agata, S)
October 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Referring the Case to Post-Screening ADR Project and Staying the Case for 90 Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/18. Case stayed. (Gonzalez, R)
July 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER ADOPTING FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATION DISMISSING Tulare County Sheriff's Department With Prejudice; Plaintiff to Proceed on Excessive Force Claims Against Defendants Garcia and Cook 19 , signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 7/27/2018. (Hellings, J)
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION That Plaintiff Proceed Only on Excessive Force Claims Against E. Garcia and G. Cook and That Tulare County Sheriff's Department and All Claims Against It Be Dismissed 17 , signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/21/2018: 21-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laneley v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Laneley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tulare County Sheriff Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?