Daniels v. Sherman
Plaintiff: Norman Daniels, III
Defendant: Stu Sherman
Case Number: 1:2016cv01313
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER ADOPTING 26 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING Plaintiff's 23 Motion for Reconsideration, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 3/3/2020. (Marrujo, C)
August 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration of Dismissal and Request to Allow Merger 23 , be Denied ; referred to Judge Ishii, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/30/2019. Objections to F&R due 30-Day Deadline (Martin-Gill, S)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER DENYING 20 Motion Class Certification and Appointment of Interim Class Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/15/19. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as Barred by Res Judicata signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/20/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE Why Action Should Not Be Dismissed as Barred By Doctrine of Res Judicata, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/19/16: 60-Day Deadline. (Hellings, J)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Clerk to FILE the 12 Motion for Extension of Time in this Action as a Motion for Extension of Time in Case 1:16-cv-01312-EPG(PC)) signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/29/2016. (Sant Agata, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels v. Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Daniels, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stu Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?