Jones v. Speidell et al
Plaintiff: Charles B. Jones
Defendant: R. Speidell, M. D. Biter, P. Vera, S. Rimbach, R. Corely, T. S. Artlitz, M. Stewart, M. Chambers, B. Andrews, C. Phifferer and S. Tallerico
Case Number: 1:2016cv01335
Filed: September 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kern
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Sheila K. Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 65 Motion for Preliminary Injunction signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/12/2021. (Flores, E)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 THIRD SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 03/10/2021. Telephonic Trial Confirmation Hearing set for 11/29/2021 at 10:00 AM, before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 2/7/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Flores, E)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER reassigning case signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/16/2021. New case number 1:16-cv-01335-JLT-(PC). (Lundstrom, T)
January 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER & WRIT of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum to Appear for Telephonic Appearance, Charles Jones, CDCR# AH-8091, on February 1, 2021 at 1:30 p.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/05/2021.(Flores, E)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER DENYING 61 Motion to Appoint Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/17/2020. (Marrujo, C)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DENYING 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and 52 Motion for Default Judgment signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/21/2020. (Jessen, A)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER DENYING 47 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/09/2019. (Flores, E)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE and ORDER that Inmate, Charles B. Jones, CDC #AH-8091, is no Longer Needed as a Witness in these Proceedings, and the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum is Discharged signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 04/23/2019. (Flores, E)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Charles B. Jones #AH-8091 on April 23, 2019, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 3/22/19. (Gonzalez, R)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Referring Case to Post-Screening ADR Project and Staying Case for 90 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/18/2019. (Jessen, A)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER adopting 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and dismissing certain claims and defendants signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/27/2018. (Lundstrom, T)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION that Plaintiff Proceed Only on Retaliation Claims Against R. Speidell and M. Stewart and that S. Rimbach, R. Corely, T.S. Artlitz, M. Chambers, B. Andrews, M.D. Biter, P. Versa, S. Tallerico, and C. Pfieffer and All Claims Against Them be Dismissed re 21 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 5/23/18. Referred to Judge Drozd. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 23 Motion Seeking De Novo Review of Magistrate Judge's Order, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 3/19/18. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Speidell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles B. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Speidell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. D. Biter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Vera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Rimbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Corely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. S. Artlitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Phifferer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Tallerico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?