Shehee v. Perez et al
Plaintiff: Gregory Ell Shehee
Defendant: Faith Perez, Audrey King, Jack Carter and Pam Ahlin
Case Number: 1:2016cv01346
Filed: September 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Anthony W. Ishii
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER ADOPTING 79 Findings and Recommendations Regarding Defendant's 78 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Failure to Comply with Court Order signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 9/9/2020. CASE CLOSED.(Sant Agata, S)
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding 78 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution and Failure to Comply With Court Order re 30 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/10/2020. Referred to Judge Ishii; Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING IN PART 69 Defendant's Motion for Order Amending Scheduling Order and Compelling Plaintiff's Deposition ; ORDER DENYING 74 Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/9/2020. Discovery Deadline set for 5/8/2020. Dispositive Motions Deadline set for 7/7/2020. (Rivera, O)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's Objection to Deposition without Scheduling Order re 67 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/5/19. (Gonzalez, R)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER Striking Untimely Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/04/2019. (Flores, E)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Adopting 59 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding DISMISSAL of Defendant Lain without Prejudice for Failure to Serve; ORDER to Recaption Case signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/26/2019. (Sant Agata, S)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal of Defendant Lain without Prejudice for Failure to Serve re 54 , signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/8/19. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why Defendant Lain Should not be Dismissed from this Action for Failure to Provide Sufficient Information to Effectuate Service signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 08/27/2018. Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2018.(Flores, E)
August 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING Service by the United States Marshals Service without prepayment of costs,signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/17/18. (Service Documents for Jerri Lain (Jirri Lan) forwarded to USM-Fresno per this order) (Martin-Gill, S)
June 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Submit Service Documents or Show Cause why this action should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 06/19/2018. (Case Management Deadline: 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER ADOPTING 39 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 05/09/2018. (Flores, E)
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Service Documents signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/08/2018. Service Documents Deadline: 6/11/2018.(Flores, E)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Directing Clerk's Office to Re-Serve February 28, 2018 Orders 39 , 40 on Plaintiff; ORDER Extending Deadline to Submit Service Documents and File Objections to Findings and Recommendations, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/7/18. Thirty Day Deadline. (Gonzalez, R)
February 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 2/27/18. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
August 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER GRANTING 25 Motion for Court Order Directing Sheriff's Department to Send $400.00 Filing Fee; ORDER DIRECTING Payment of Inmate Filing Fee by Fresno County Jail, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/16/17. (Marrujo, C)
June 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER DENYING 21 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER ADOPTING 22 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS; this matter is referred back to assigned Magistrate for proceedings consistent with this order; Plaintiff shall pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full to proceed with this action, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 06/27/17. (45 Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Plaintiff's 21 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/10/17. Referred to Judge Ishii. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Gonzalez, R)
March 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING 16 Motion for Judgment as Premature, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/27/17. (Marrujo, C)
October 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING 2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and ORDER DISMISSING ACTION Without Prejudice to Refiling With Submission of $400.00 Filing Fee signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 10/14/2016. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shehee v. Perez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Ell Shehee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Faith Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Audrey King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pam Ahlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?