Smith v. Goss, et al.
Plaintiff: Lawrence Christopher Smith
Defendant: D. Goss, P. Chanelo and B L Parrot
Case Number: 1:2016cv01356
Filed: September 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Kings
Presiding Judge: Barbara A. McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending Dismissal With Prejudice for Bad Faith Conduct re 12 Amended Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/12/2021. Referred to Unassigned DJ; Objections to F&R due within twenty-one (21) days. (Rivera, O)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING 64 Plaintiff's Request for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Ruling, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/31/2020. This action is referred back to the magistrate judge for proceedings consistent with this order. (Rivera, O)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 69 Third Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/16/2020. Discovery Deadline: November 2, 2020; Exhaustion Motion Deadline: January 4, 2021; Dispositive Motion Deadline: February 16, 2021. (Marrujo, C)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER GRANTING IN PART Defendants' 66 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 5/19/2020. (Discovery Deadline: 09/18/2020, Exhaustion Motion Deadline: 11/18/2020 and Dispositive Motion Deadline: 02/16/2021) (Martin-Gill, S)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 41 46 Motions to Amend the Complaint; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 45 Motion for Joinder of Claims; ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's 51 Motion for Stay or Modification of Discovery and Scheduling Order Based on Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/24/2020. (Sant Agata, S)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Relief from Judgment; ORDER DENYING 39 Plaintiff's Motion for a Protective Order; ORDER GRANTING 40 Defendants' Request to Modify Discovery and Scheduling Order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/18/2020. Discovery Deadline set for 5/18/2020. Deadline to File Motions for Summary Judgment set for 7/6/2020. Dispositive Motions Deadline set for 11/6/2020. (Rivera, O)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' 49 Request for Extension of Time to Oppose Plaintiff's Motions Nunc Pro Tunc; ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's 52 Motion for 30-Day Extension of Time to File Reply Re: Motion to Amend the Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/31/2020. ( Reply due within THIRTY (30) DAYS.) (Orozco, A)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Submit Completed Service Documents or Show Cause why this Action Should not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/05/2019. Twenty-One Day Deadline. (Flores, E)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER Denying 20 Motion for Relief from Judgment; ORDER Denying 22 Motion to Amend; ORDER Denying 24 Motion for Reconsideration of Judgment signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 03/25/2019. (Flores, E)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants and to Sever Certain Claims; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Open Three (3) New Actions; ORDER DIRECTING Plaintiff to Submit Filing Fee or Application to proceed In Forma Pauperis as to each new action, signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill on 06/18/18. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Directing Clerk of Court to Randomly Assign District Judge to Action; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Regarding Dismissal of Certain Claims and Defendants and to Sever Certain Claims signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/23/2018. Referred to Judge O'Neill; Objections to F&R due by 6/11/2018.(Flores, E)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Goss, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Christopher Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Goss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P. Chanelo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B L Parrot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?