Castro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Richard Castro
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2016cv01390
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Gary S. Austin
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Dismissing This Case for Failure to Follow a Court Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 3/8/17. Objections to F&R Due Within Fourteen Days. (Marrujo, C)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 2/16/2017: Plaintiff is ordered to show cause why this case should be dismissed for a failure to comply with this Court's order. Plaintiff is ORDERED to file a written response to this Order to Show Cause WITHIN 14 (fourteen) days of the date of this Order. In the alternative, Plaintiff may file the amended complaint. Plaintiff is advised that failure to file a timely response to this order will result in dismissal of this action. (Valdez, E)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND 1 , signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 9/23/16. (Hellings, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castro v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Castro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?