U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dash Dream Plant Inc.
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Defendant: Dash Dream Plant Inc.
Case Number: 1:2016cv01395
Filed: September 20, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: Dale A. Drozd
Presiding Judge: Erica P. Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER GRANTING Joint 42 Motion to Approve Consent Decree signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/13/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR COURT'S APPROVAL OF CONSENT DECREE. The Court grants the parties an extension until 9/19/2017, to file the motion for the Court's approval on the proposed consent decree. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 9/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
August 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER RE EXTENSION - The parties joint request to file the settlement documents or file a status report by October 2, 2017 is DENIED.However, the parties shall have until Tuesday, September 12, 2017 to file their dispositional documents. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/31/2017. (Hernandez, M)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER RE JOINT STATUS UPDATE AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. The Court hereby grants the parties requested extension and orders the parties to file the settlement documents or a status update by August 31, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/27/2017. (Hernandez, M)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER AND JOINT STATUS UPDATE AND REQUEST FOR EXTENTION OF TIME. The Court hereby grants the parties requested extension and orders the parties to file the settlement documents by July 31, 2017. No further extensions will be granted absent good cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/28/2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 JOINT STATUS UPDATE AND REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/31/2017. The Court hereby grants the parties' requested extension and orders the parties to file the settlement documents or a status update by June 30, 2017. (Hernandez, M)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. The Court hereby grants the parties requested extension and orders the parties to file the settlement documents or a status update by May 31, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/12/2017. (Hernandez, M)
April 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order following settlement; vacating dates and directing parties to file dispositive documents, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2017. (Consent Decree Deadline: 5/15/2017) (Rosales, O)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISCHARGING 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/25/2017. (Jessen, A)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT STATEMENT AND SHOW CAUSE WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT ISSUE FOR THE FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THESCHEDULING ORDER. DEADLINE: APRIL 24, 2017 - Defendant shall submit a confidential settlement state ment that complies with the January 25, 2017 scheduling conference order by 9:00 a.m. on Monday, April 24, 2017; and Defendant shall show cause in writing why sanctions should not issue for the failure to comply with the October 16, 2015 scheduling order by noon on Monday, April 24, 2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/21/2017. (Hernandez, M)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order continuing initial scheduling conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 11/01/2016. ( Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 12/20/2016 has been CONTINUED TO 1/23/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean.) The parties shall conduct their Rule 26(f) conference on or before January 2, 2017, and their joint scheduling report shall be filed with the Court no later than January 16, 2017. (Dean, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Dash Dream Plant Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Equal Employment Opportunity Commission
Represented By: Anna Y Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dash Dream Plant Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?