Fowler v. Smith et al

Plaintiff: Gary Fowler
Defendant: Steven Smith, Michael Forster, Neil Ridge and Jack St. Claire
Case Number: 1:2016cv01401
Filed: September 6, 2016
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Fresno Office
County: Tuolumne
Presiding Judge: Michael J. Seng
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING 33 Letter from Plaintiff; Clerk to Send Plaintiff Copy of ECF Nos. 31 and 32 at Address Listed on ECF No. 33 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 9/12/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
August 21, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING ACTION, Without Prejudice, for Failure to Provide a Current Address signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 8/18/2017. CASE CLOSED. (Jessen, A)
May 16, 2017 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISCHARGING 24 Order to Show Cause signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/16/2017. (Sant Agata, S)
May 12, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS SMITH, FORSTER, RIDGE, AND ST. CLAIR TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DEFAULT SHOULD NOT BE ENTERED 23 signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 5/11/2017. Show Cause Response due within 14-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
September 21, 2016 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:16-cv-2131 CKD PC) to Fresno (1:16-cv-1401 MJS PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/21/2016. (Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fowler v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Fowler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Forster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neil Ridge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack St. Claire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?